Khoury, Ludwig Edward (CPSO#: 61143)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 26
Watertown NY  13601
United States
Phone: (713) 320-5454
Fax: (315) 782-8084

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California
USA - New York
USA - Pennsylvania
USA - Texas

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LUDWIG EDWARD KHOURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOURY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990