Khoury, Michael Anthony (CPSO#: 92971)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 Nov 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2016