Khoury, Nasri Jamil Sami (CPSO#: 50966)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Aug 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Aug 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Birmingham, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 1504
65 Harbour Square
Toronto ON  M5J 2L4
Phone: (416) 367-0368
Electoral District: 10

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Jordan
United Kingdom

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 26 Nov 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NASRI JAMIL SAMI KHOURY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOURY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1984
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 02 Aug 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2002