Khoury, Shahira Shokri Beshay (CPSO#: 50967)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 02 Jun 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Jun 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records created by Dr. Khoury between 2005-2008 are with Dr. Anwar Morgan at Dr. Khoury's last practice address: 4800 Leslie Street Tel: (416) 221-1061 Records created between 1999-2005 can be obtained by contacting: Record Storage & Retrieval Services Inc. 111 St. Regis Crescent S. Toronto, Ontario M3J 1Y6 Tel: (416) 398-0638 Toll Free: 1-888-563-3732 Fax: (416) 398-5932 Website: www.rsrs.com
Date Received: 14 Apr 2009

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

USA - California

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Nov 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 1986
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 02 Jun 2016