Khraishi, Majed Mustafa (CPSO#: 61702)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 25 Aug 1999

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 25 Aug 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Ain Shams University, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective: 03 Dec 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jan 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 25 Aug 1999