Khunein, Saleh Abdullah Abdulaziz (CPSO#: 92342)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2011

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Faisal University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2010 to 11 Mar 2010
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 12 Mar 2010 to 31 Dec 2010
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011