Khunkhun, Jasvine Sevena (CPSO#: 65029)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Apr 2016


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hindi, Panjabi/Punjabi

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 150
625 Agnes Street
New Westminister BC  V3M 5Y4
Phone: (604) 524-5051

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 2000 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. JASVINE SEVENA KHUNKHUN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHUNKHUN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 15 Jun 1992 to 14 Jun 1993
Resident 1 - Rotating Internship

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2016