Khurana, Puneeta (CPSO#: 111639)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Jan 2018

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: PGE - Clinical Fellow as of 16 Jan 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Medical University of the Americas, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Postgraduate Medical Education
University of Toronto
500 University Avenue, Suite 602
Toronto ON  M5G 1V7
Electoral District: 10

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PUNEETA KHURANA may practise medicine only as required by the clinical or research fellowship program in which Dr. KHURANA is enrolled at UNIVERSITY OF TORONTO;

(2) Dr. KHURANA shall prescribe drugs only for in-patients or out-patients of a clinical teaching unit that is formally affiliated with the department where Dr. KHURANA is properly practising medicine and to which postgraduate trainees are regularly assigned by the department as part of its program of postgraduate medical education;

(3) Dr. KHURANA shall not charge a fee for medical services;

(4) The certificate expires on the earliest of the following times:

(i) When Dr. KHURANA ceases to hold the appointment as a clinical or research fellow for which the certificate is issued,

(ii) When Dr. KHURANA ceases to hold Canadian citizenship, permanent resident status or a valid employment authorization under the Immigration Act (Canada), or

(iii) When three years have elapsed from the date the certificate is issued.

Note: This certificate expires on 30 Jun 2018.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 03 Apr 2017 to 28 Apr 2017
Elective Trainee - Palliative Care Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Apr 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Apr 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2018