Khzam, Mohamed Omar S (CPSO#: 85970)

Current Status: Active Member as of 25 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Saint John Regional Hospital
PO Box 2100
St John NB  E2L 4L2
Phone: (506) 648-6539

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

New Brunswick

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Hematological Pathology Effective: 29 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOHAMED OMAR S KHZAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHZAM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 02 Apr 2007 to 10 Jun 2007
PEAP - Resident - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2009 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Jan 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2011 to 31 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2012 to 31 Jan 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Feb 2013 to 28 Feb 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematological Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 02 Apr 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Aug 2016