Ki, Vincent (CPSO#: 87066)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Cantonese, English, Mandarin

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room 301
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone: (905) 272-1104
Fax: (905) 272-1105
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Vincent Ki Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 18 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Ki ( CPSO# 87066 )

Business Address:
Suite 301
101 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 272-1104

Business Address:
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2200

Business Address:
Credit Valley Kidney Care Clinic
Suite 121 and 125
75 Watline Avenue
Mississauga ON  L4Z 3E5
Phone Number: (905) 813-4240

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist
Nephrology Effective: 24 Sep 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VINCENT KI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011