Kiage, Daniel Oira (CPSO#: 86136)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Nairobi, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 14 May 2007 to 17 Jun 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 18 Jun 2007 to 13 May 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 14 May 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 May 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 17 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008