Kiaii, Bob Babak (CPSO#: 64977)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Persian

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3153
Fax: (519) 663-3044
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kiaii Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 28 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kiaii ( CPSO# 64977 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
University Campus
339 Windermere Road
Suite B6 - 108
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3153

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 18 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BOB BABAK KIAII may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIAII is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Dec 2001
PostGrad Yr 7 - Cardiac Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jan 2002 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 1993