Kidwai, Bakhtiar Jalil (CPSO#: 73916)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 14 Oct 2002

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 14 Oct 2002

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Karachi, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Oct 2001 to 14 Oct 2002
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2001
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Oct 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 14 Oct 2002