Kiefer, Lori Anne (CPSO#: 68272)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Dec 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
25 Grosvenor Avenue
16th floor
Toronto ON  M7A 1Y6
Phone: (416) 327-2389
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Community Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LORI ANNE KIEFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIEFER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 1996