Kieffer, Marilyn Ann (CPSO#: 60951)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Jul 1990


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Village Health Centre
Applewood Village Plaza
1077 North Service Road
Suite 27
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Phone: (905) 949-1700
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marilyn Kieffer Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2015

Dr. M. Kieffer ( CPSO# 60951 )

Business Address:
Village Health Centre
Applewood Village Paza
27 - 1077 North Service Road
Mississauga ON  L4Y 1A6
Phone Number: (905) 949-1700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Jun 1991 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions


(1) Dr. MARILYN ANN KIEFFER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIEFFER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jul 1990