Kieser, Teresa Mary (CPSO#: 29232)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 20 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 20 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiovascular and Thoracic Surgery Effective: 24 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist
General Surgery Effective: 18 Nov 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 20 Jul 2007