Kigozi, Phoebe (CPSO#: 108076)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Sep 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Sep 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Makerere Univ, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2015 to 17 Dec 2015
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 18 Dec 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Sep 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Sep 2017