Kilani, Mehrak (CPSO#: 85278)

Current Status: Active Member as of 30 Jun 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Moradhamzehe Kilani, Mehrak (used until: 29 Apr 2013 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Royal Court Medical Centre
Suite 305
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone: (705) 728-5311
Fax: (705) 728-5601
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Mehrak Kilani Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 09 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kilani ( CPSO# 85278 )

Business Address:
Royal Court Medical Centre
Suite 305
1 Quarry Ridge Road
Barrie ON  L4M 7G1
Phone Number: (705) 728-5311

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie
Stevenson Memorial Hospital Alliston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEHRAK KILANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILANI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2011