Kilby, Donald Leo Paul (CPSO#: 30428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Sep 1978

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Ottawa Health Services
Suite 300
100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: (613) 564-6627
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Donald Kilby Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 02 2004

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kilby ( CPSO# 30428 )

Business Address:
300 - 100 Marie Curie Private
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N5
Phone Number: (613) 564-7826

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD LEO PAUL KILBY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILBY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1977
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 1978

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 19, 2017
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person and Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee (“ICRC”) in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" or a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of ICRC. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s ICRC may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed.

Summaries will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. This posting requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

Note: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person and a SCERP:
Download Full Document (PDF)