Kilgar, Jennifer Lauri (CPSO#: 70306)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
Room E4-211
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 58134
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Church Kilgar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 3 2014


Corporation Name: J. L. Kilgar Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kilgar ( CPSO# 70306 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Room E4-211
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 24 May 2001 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER LAURI KILGAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KILGAR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 03 Nov 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 31 Oct 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Nov 2003 to 31 Dec 2003
PostGrad Yr 6 - Paediatric Emergency Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Nov 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2003