Kim, Daniel Hwan (CPSO#: 71432)

Current Status: Active Member as of 19 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone: (905) 895-4521
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Daniel H. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 28 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kim ( CPSO# 71432 )

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIEL HWAN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1997
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2002
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 15 Aug 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 2013