Kim, David (CPSO#: 67845)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Aug 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone: 519-464-4400 Ext. 5214
Electoral District: 01
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

475 Christina Street North
Sarnia ON  N7T 5W3
Canada
Phone: 519-337-0537
County: County of Lambton
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: D. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 28 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kim ( CPSO# 67845 )

Business Address:
89 Norman Street
Sarnia ON  N7T 6S3
Phone Number: (519) 464-4400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Bluewater Health Sarnia

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Aug 1996