Kim, Dennis (CPSO#: 77514)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jul 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1844 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N3H 3R9
Phone: (519) 650-4510
Fax: (519) 650-6045
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dennis Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Kim ( CPSO# 77514 )

Business Address:
1844 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N3H 3R9
Phone Number: (519) 650-4510

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Urology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DENNIS KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Urology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Urology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2007