Kim, George Paul (CPSO#: 79011)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Byron Family Medical Centre
1228 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone: (519) 472-9670
Fax: (519) 657-1766
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: G. P. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kim ( CPSO# 79011 )

Business Address:
Byron Family Medical Centre
1228 Commissioners Road West
London ON  N6K 1C7
Phone Number: (519) 472-9670

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Four Counties Health Services,Newbury Newbury
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Aug 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GEORGE PAUL KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 31 Aug 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Aug 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Sep 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 31 Aug 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 2005