Kim, H. Hyung (CPSO#: 58515)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 205
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone: (905) 646-2525
Fax: (905) 646-3251
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. H. Hyung Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kim ( CPSO# 58515 )

Business Address:
Suite 205
589 Lake Street
St Catharines ON  L2N 7L6
Phone Number: (905) 646-2545

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Quebec

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 22 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. H. HYUNG KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 1988