Kim, Hahn Hoe (CPSO#: 70252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone: (519) 576-3099
Fax: (519) 576-3112
Electoral District: 03
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Blvd.
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Canada
Phone: (519) 744-3311
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. H. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Kim ( CPSO# 70252 )

Business Address:
St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener ON  N2M 1B2
Phone Number: (519) 744-3311

Business Address:
208 - 564 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5N6
Phone Number: (519) 576-3099

Business Address:
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HAHN HOE KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2000