Kim, Jae Hong (CPSO#: 61081)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Resident 5 - Paediatric Gastroenterology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2007