Kim, Jarmila (CPSO#: 63563)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Aug 1992

Summary

Former Name: Rausa, Jarmila (used until: 06 Sep 1993 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Slovak

Education:University of Ottawa, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
401 Smyth Road
Department of Anaesthesia
Childrens Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-2431
Fax: (613) 737-4815
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jarmila Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 18 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kim ( CPSO# 63563 )

Business Address:
Childrens Hospital of Eastern Ontario
Department of Anaesthesia
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone Number: (613) 737-2431

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JARMILA KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Aug 1992