Kim, Ji Hyun (CPSO#: 91252)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jul 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Yorktown Family Medicine
Suite 205
1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3B 2W7
Phone: (416) 331-9595
Fax: (416) 331-9593
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 05 Jul 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JI HYUN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 12 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 2011