Kim, Jin Hee (CPSO#: 87262)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:The University of British Columbia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 300
480 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1V2
Phone: (647) 260-7494
Fax: (647) 260-7600
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist
Public Health and Preventive Medicine Effective: 25 Jul 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JIN HEE KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 25 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 25 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Public Health and Preventive Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009