Kim, Joe (CPSO#: 70460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 201
535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E9
Phone: (519) 579-4870
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kim ( CPSO# 70460 )

Business Address:
Suite 201
535 Belmont Avenue West
Kitchener ON  N2M 5E9
Phone Number: (519) 579-4870

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 09 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOE KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1998