Kim, John (CPSO#: 67744)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Room W2284
General Site
The Ottawa Hospital (TOH)
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 79830
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Kim and Sunita Lal Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 15 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Lal ( CPSO# 69946 )
Dr. J. Kim ( CPSO# 67744 )

Business Address:
304 - 1580 Merivale Road
Ottawa ON  K2G 4B5
Phone Number: (613) 686-7580

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
CCW 2284
Ottawa ON  K1H 4B5
Phone Number: (613) 017-8899

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 6 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998