Kim, Joon-Hyung John (CPSO#: 61067)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
University Health Network
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone: (416) 946-2919
Fax: (416) 946-6561
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Caroline Huh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 04 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Kim ( CPSO# 61067 )
Dr. C. Huh ( CPSO# 65211 )

Business Address:
410 - 2863 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 5E9
Phone Number: (416) 286-3743

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
University Health Network,Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario Cancer Institute Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOON-HYUNG JOHN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 1991