Kim, Meehai Marie (CPSO#: 53952)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 Apr 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
ErinoakkIds
2277 South Millway
Mississauga ON  L5L 2M5
Phone: (905) 855-2690 Ext. 2427
Fax: (905) 820-2756
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John McPhaden Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kim ( CPSO# 53952 )
Dr. J. McPhaden ( CPSO# 54132 )

Business Address:
Suite 118
1060 Speers Road
Oakville ON  L6L 2X4
Phone Number: (905) 815-8914

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 08 Jun 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MEEHAI MARIE KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Apr 1989