Kim, Miriam Yun Mi (CPSO#: 65252)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 23 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 1999 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
Resident 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 31 Jul 1999
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Jun 1993
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 23 Jun 2008