Kim, Myung-Gi (CPSO#: 54088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone: (905) 871-0364
Fax: (905) 871-2204
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Bridges Community Health Center
1485 Garrison Rd.
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1P8
Canada
Phone: (905) 871-7621
Fax: (905) 871-9135
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dalgleish Jayawardene & Luterman Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 24 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Luterman ( CPSO# 59109 )
Dr. M. Kim ( CPSO# 54088 )
Dr. R. Kamatovic ( CPSO# 79557 )
Dr. N. Jayawardene ( CPSO# 72587 )
Dr. D. James ( CPSO# 55701 )
Dr. N. Hoosen ( CPSO# 80356 )
Dr. D. Henry ( CPSO# 22752 )
Dr. C. Che ( CPSO# 56739 )
Dr. J. Colorado ( CPSO# 74233 )
Dr. B. Dalgleish ( CPSO# 50321 )
Dr. K. Scher ( CPSO# 85889 )

Business Address:
7 - 238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 871-6600


Corporation Name: Dr. Myung-Gi Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kim ( CPSO# 54088 )

Business Address:
238 Bertie Street
Fort Erie ON  L2A 1Z3
Phone Number: (905) 871-0364

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MYUNG-GI KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1985