Kim, Paul Roy (CPSO#: 61962)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1990

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Aug 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Room W1650 Orthopaedics
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8774
Fax: (613) 737-8837
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Paul R. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 16 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. P. Kim ( CPSO# 61962 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital - General Campus
Room W1650 Orthopaedics
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-8774

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PAUL ROY KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Aug 1991