Kim, Peter Chul Woo (CPSO#: 55903)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Nov 1986

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Korean

Education:McGill University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#806
260 Doris Avenue
Toronto ON  M2N 6X9
Phone: 416-385-7338
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: P.C. Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 8 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 08 Nov 1993 RCPSC Specialist
Pediatric General Surgery Effective: 22 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER CHUL WOO KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 7 - Paediatric Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Nov 1986