Kim, Rak Hay (CPSO#: 22828)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 30 Jul 2013

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 30 Jul 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Japanese, Korean

Education:Seoul National University, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Records Management Ltd. Unit 13 1 High Meadow Place Toronto, Ontario M9L 0A3 Tel: 1-800-775-0093 Fax: (647) 933-2904 Website: www.recordsregistry.ca
Date Received: 27 Jun 2012

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 10 Mar 1970 RCPSC Specialist
Endocrinology and Metabolism Effective: 11 Sep 1987 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1965
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 1970
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 30 Jul 2013