Kim, Richard Sang Jun (CPSO#: 63938)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Jun 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone: (415) 530-6004
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Richard Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Kim ( CPSO# 63938 )

Business Address:
St. Joseph Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6004

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1993 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RICHARD SANG JUN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 17 Jun 1991 to 15 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 1992