Kim, Sarah Yeong Jeen (CPSO#: 79078)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Rebalance Sports Medicine
905 - 110 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1T4
Phone: (416) 777-9999
Fax: 8663381236
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Division of Orthopaedic Surgery
Toronto Western Hospital
University Health Network
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Canada
Phone: 416 603-5267
Fax: 416 603-3437
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Division of Orthopaedics
St. Joseph's Health Centre
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Canada
Phone: 416-530-6731
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sarah Kim Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 10 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Kim ( CPSO# 79078 )

Business Address:
Rebalance Sports Medicine
Suite 905
110 Yonge Street
Toronto ON  M5C 1T4
Phone Number: (416) 777-9999

Business Address:
St. Josephs Health Centre
Department of Surgery
30 The Queensway
Toronto ON  M6R 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 530-6090

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Centre,Toronto Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 15 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SARAH YEONG JEEN KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2005 to 31 Oct 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Nov 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Community Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2005