Kim, Vy Hong-Diep Ngoc (CPSO#: 80707)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2004

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 05 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Kim, Hong-Diep Ngoc (used until: 18 Jun 2012 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Immunology/Allergy
555 University Ave.
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-8627
Fax: 416-813-8638
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

123 Edward St., Suite 920
Toronto ON  M5G 1E2
Canada
Phone: 647-352-2554
Fax: 866-881-7790
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist
Clinical Immunology and Allergy Effective: 03 Oct 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. VY HONG-DIEP NGOC KIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIM is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Jun 2009