Kimball, Brian Peter (CPSO#: 32508)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1977

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Sheppard Heart Centre
#740
100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 6N5
Phone: (416) 224-0375
Fax: (416) 224-1895
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Brian P. Kimball Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 17 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kimball ( CPSO# 32508 )

Business Address:
740 - 100 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 6N5
Phone Number: (416) 224-0375

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 07 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 04 Dec 1985 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN PETER KIMBALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIMBALL is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1981
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Oct 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985