Kimber, Shane Kieran Martin (CPSO#: 54581)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 1985

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division Of Cardiology
2C2 Walter C Mackenzie
Health Science Centre
Edmonton AB  T6G 2B7
Phone: (780) 407-6946
Fax: (780) 407-6452

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1988 RCPSC Specialist
Cardiology Effective: 29 Nov 1989 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHANE KIERAN MARTIN KIMBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIMBER is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Other - Comprehensive Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Cardiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 1985