Kimberley, Nicholas Anthony (CPSO#: 62052)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1997

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 1997

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 07 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - General Surgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1997