Kimmett, Mary Karen (CPSO#: 60426)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2008


Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available


Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Aug 1989 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 23 Dec 1988
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Oct 1993
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2008