Kimmons, Gerard Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 58711)

Current Status: Active Member as of 20 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 20 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 230
4600 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone: (647) 227-3745
Fax: (905)850-7919
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

300 John Street
Thornhill ON  L3T 5W4
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G. Kimmons Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 27 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Kimmons ( CPSO# 58711 )

Business Address:
4600 Highway 7
Suite 230
Vaughan ON  L4L 4Y7
Phone Number: (647) 227-3745

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 16 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GERARD MICHAEL JOSEPH KIMMONS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIMMONS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1987 to 31 Dec 1989
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1990 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1993 to 31 Dec 1993
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1994 to 31 Dec 1994
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 1987
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Expiry: 09 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2008