Kimpinski, Kurt (CPSO#: 78310)

Current Status: Active Member as of 16 Apr 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 16 Apr 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department Of Clinical Neurological
Sciences University Hospital
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3337
Fax: (519) 663-3328
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KURT KIMPINSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KIMPINSKI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2009