Kindler, Alan Ronald (CPSO#: 25303)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2015

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Melbourne, 1964

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Alan Ronald Kindler Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jun 11 2015

Medical Records Location

Address: 49 Jackman Avenue Toronto, ON M4K 2X5
Date Received: 27 May 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 17 Nov 1971 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Temporary Employment Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1971
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 1972
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2015