King, Aaron David (CPSO#: 79129)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
45 Mill Street
Toronto ON  M5A 3R6
Phone: 4168693376
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A2P7
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Haldimand-Norfolk
Electoral District: 04

150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Canada
Phone: (416) 350-5967
Fax: (416) 350-5980
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: King Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 15 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. A. King ( CPSO# 79129 )

Business Address:
206 John Street
Dunnville ON  N1A 2P7
Phone Number: (905) 774-7431

Business Address:
45 Mill Street
Toronto ON  M5A 3R6
Phone Number: (416) 869-3376

Business Address:
150 York Street
Suite 1500
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5
Phone Number: (416) 350-5900

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Dermatology Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. AARON DAVID KING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KING is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Dermatology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Dermatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2005